MD HB17 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing an institution of higher education, a related medical facility, or an affiliated biomedical research firm to file with the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission a registration to purchase medical cannabis for the purpose of conducting a bona fide research project relating to the medical uses, properties, or composition of cannabis; requiring the Commission to allow certain dispensaries and dispensary agents to acquire, possess, transfer, sell, distribute or dispense edible cannabis products; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Processing and Dispensing Medical Cannabis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-10) (Y: 130 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 456
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateMotion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateCommittee Amendment Withdrawn
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {218273/1
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-04-08SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-04-08SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (130-10)
2019-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {226983/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-04-04HouseHearing canceled
2019-04-04HouseHearing 4/05 at 11:00 a.m.
2019-01-22HouseHearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-11-20HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0017&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0017f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0017t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_456_hb0017t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0017_22698301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0017_21827301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb0017.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0017_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0017_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1499.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1420.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback