MD HB171 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the circumstances under which a certain provision of law requiring a campaign finance entity to terminate and file a final campaign finance report applies; altering the time period within which a certain campaign finance entity is required to terminate and file a final campaign finance report; and requiring the State Board of Elections, not later than 6 months before a campaign finance entity is required to terminate, to provide a certain notification to the responsible persons affiliated with the campaign finance entity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination and Filing of Final Campaign Finance Report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateHearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-04SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-04-02SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-04-01HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments {105169/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback