MD HB1729 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to provide sufficient funds in the budget to ensure that the value of temporary cash assistance, combined with federal food stamps, is equal to at least certain percentages of the State minimum living level for certain fiscal years.
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2018-02-19 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |