MD HB173 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying certain provisions of law governing Sunday hunting in the State; establishing the authority of the Department of Natural Resources to allow Sunday hunting under certain circumstances; altering the application of authorized Sunday hunting to junior hunts and holders of a deer management permit; prohibiting hunting on certain public land on Sunday; repealing a certain termination provision governing authorized Sunday hunting in Montgomery County; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-17SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
2020-03-14SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-06SenateReferred Rules
2020-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (130-6)
2020-03-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {550319/1 Adopted
2020-03-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-21HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-21HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-17HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-15HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2017(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources10410(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback