MD HB1739 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $250,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of a South County Dog Park, located in Prince George's County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - South County Dog Park
Sponsors
Del. Jay Walker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 3:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Forests and Parks
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Prince George's County
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Prince George's County
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)