MD HB176 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring candidates nominated by a new political party to file a certificate of candidacy not later than 5 p.m. on the first Monday in August in the year of the general election for the office, comply with certain requirements for a certificate of candidacy, and file a certificate of nomination with the appropriate board on a certain form; providing that a candidate nominated by a new political party under certain provisions of law is not required to file a declaration of intent; etc.
Title
Election Law – Candidates – Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {505762/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Ballots
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Education, Boards of
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Forms
Notices
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Political Parties
Public Officials
Signatures
Time
Ballots
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Education, Boards of
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Forms
Notices
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Political Parties
Public Officials
Signatures
Time