MD HB178 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to provide for the renovation of the Ocean City Convention facility; increasing, from $17,340,000 to $24,500,000, the amount the Board of Public Works may approve for the issuance of certain bonds related to the Ocean City Convention facility without receiving authorization by the General Assembly; altering certain contribution amounts, allocations of savings, and leasehold ownership allocations that must be contained in a certain lease or other written agreement with Ocean City; etc.
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2019-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Bonds
Capital Budgets
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
General Assembly
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Ocean City
Public Works, Board of
Stadium Authority
Stadiums
Bonds
Capital Budgets
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
General Assembly
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Ocean City
Public Works, Board of
Stadium Authority
Stadiums