MD HB179 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying that the warden of Patuxent Institution is the appointing authority for correctional officers assigned to Patuxent Institution and staff attached to the office of the warden; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services - Patuxent Institution - Appointing Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 146
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-26SenateReassigned to Finance
2019-02-25SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-20HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-18HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-02-01HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback