MD HB18 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "certifying provider" to include physician assistants who have an active unrestricted license to practice, have an active delegation agreement with a physician who is a certifying provider, and are in good standing with the State Board of Physicians; and altering the membership of the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-14) (Y: 123 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {408176/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-15HouseThird Reading Passed (122-14)
2019-02-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {276480/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-01-22HouseHearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-11-20HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback