MD HB180 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to issue electronic credentials in addition to, and not instead of, a license or an identification card; defining an "electronic credential" as an electronic representation of a license, an identification card, or a data field; establishing that a credential holder satisfies certain license display requirements; authorizing the Administration to create an electronic credential; authorizing an alcoholic beverages license holder to accept an electronic credential as proof of age; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Licenses and Identification Cards - Electronic Credentials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {860410/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Alcoholic Beverages
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Cybersecurity
Data
Disclosure
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Federal Government
Fees
Fraud
Highways
Identification
Interstate Affairs
Law Enforcement
Mobile Devices
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Notices
Privacy
Records
Rules and Regulations
Signatures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Alcoholic Beverages
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Cybersecurity
Data
Disclosure
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Federal Government
Fees
Fraud
Highways
Identification
Interstate Affairs
Law Enforcement
Mobile Devices
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Notices
Privacy
Records
Rules and Regulations
Signatures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration