MD HB184 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to increase the number of members, require that certain members have a background in certain activities, and require that certain members attended certain institutions of higher education; altering the membership of the Board of Regents of Morgan State University and the Board of Trustees of St. Mary's College of Maryland to increase the number of members and require that certain members have backgrounds in certain activities; etc.
Title
University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, and St. Mary's College of Maryland - Board Membership - Alterations
Sponsors
Del. Julian Ivey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2020-09-26 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Discrimination
Ethics
Higher Education
Immigrants and Citizenship
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Unions
Discrimination
Ethics
Higher Education
Immigrants and Citizenship
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Unions
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |