MD HB185 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Prince George's County to issue a Class BLX license for a movie theater under certain circumstances; prohibiting the Board from issuing a Class BLX license to a movie theater in the 26th legislative district; authorizing the holder of the license to sell beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption; allowing the holder of the license to serve only customers who have proof of admission to the movie theater; providing the hours of sale for the license; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License for Movie Theaters PG 302-19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-3) (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-2) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
2019-04-06HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (136-3)
2019-04-06HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {694630/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-21SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-20SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (133-2)
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {513597/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0185&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0185f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0185t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0185e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_583_hb0185e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0185_51359701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0185_69463001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0185.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0185_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0874.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0185_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1416.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1191.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback