MD HB191 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-06 - Senators Smith, Hough, and Lee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-06 - Senators Smith, Hough, and Lee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions allowing individuals under the age of 17 to marry under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-36) (Y: 96 N: 37 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {703921/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (47-84) (Y: 48 N: 85 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-36) (Y: 96 N: 37 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {703921/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (47-84) (Y: 48 N: 85 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senators Smith, Hough, and Lee |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2018-04-05 | House | Delegates Sydnor, Kittleman, and Gibson |
2018-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-05 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2018-04-05 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {638474/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-36) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment {703921/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (47-84) |
2018-03-15 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {522215/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Judiciary |