MD HB192 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1292
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county board of education, beginning in the 2021-2022 school year, to install at least one video recording device in each special education classroom; requiring video recording devices to record special education classrooms and exclusion areas during school hours and during any time that the classroom or exclusion area is in use; prohibiting the use of a video recording device in bathrooms or in areas that students use to change clothing; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-01-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2020-07-08 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1292 (Carry Over) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Claims
Data
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Ethics
Law Enforcement
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Public Schools
Recordings
Reports
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Signs and Billboards
Special Education
Students
Video
Claims
Data
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Ethics
Law Enforcement
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Public Schools
Recordings
Reports
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Signs and Billboards
Special Education
Students
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 447 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 8 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0192?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0192f.pdf |