MD HB193 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain requirement that a life insurer include, in a certain manner, a certain statement on an application or an endorsement for a policy of life insurance on the life of a minor to allow the life insurer to include the statement on a certain disclosure; and applying the Act to policies of life insurance on the life of a minor issued or delivered in the State on or after January 1, 2020.
Title
Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Statement on Disclosure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed 47-0 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533 |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-02-25 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {856082/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Beneficiaries
Death
Disclosure
Homicide
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Signatures
Death
Disclosure
Homicide
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Signatures