MD HB195 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Prince George's County Board of Education, beginning in the 2020-2021 school year, to develop and implement a pilot program that includes a semester-long elective course in financial literacy as a part of the county board's high school curriculum; requiring the Board to develop the curriculum content for the course; requiring the Board to select at least one school to participate in the program; requiring the Board to submit a report by June 30 each year on the success of the program to the county's legislative delegations; etc.
Title
Prince George’s County Board of Education – Financial Literacy Pilot Program Course PG 504–19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {435461/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Certifications
Curriculum
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Prince George's County
Public Schools
School Testing
Students
Sunset
Curriculum
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Prince George's County
Public Schools
School Testing
Students
Sunset