MD HB196 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the applicability of a certain assessment by the State to certain entities for certain products that were subject to § 9010 of the Affordable Care Act, as in effect on December 1, 2019; requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to report to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee by December 1, 2020, on certain information related to establishing a State-based individual subsidy program in Maryland.
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Assessment Applicability and Report on State–Based Individual Market Health Insurance Subsidies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 105 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-9) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {766086/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-16 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB124 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 104
Subjects
Assessments
Commerce and Business
Federal Government
Fees
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
Rules and Regulations
State Aid
Commerce and Business
Federal Government
Fees
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
Rules and Regulations
State Aid