MD HB199 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the number of judges on a criminal sentence review panel; altering a definition to require review panel judges to be of a specified judicial circuit; clarifying who is entitled to a sentence review by a review panel; clarifying that a sentence includes any suspended portion for the purposes of a sentence review; repealing a provision of law authorizing a specified sentencing judge to sit with a review panel in an advisory capacity; prohibiting a review panel from conferring with a specified sentencing judge; etc.
Title
Courts - Sentence Review - Review Panel
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {693129/1 Rejected (Y: 35 N: 102 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {693129/1 Rejected (Y: 35 N: 102 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-07 | Third Reading Passed (114-25) | |
2012-02-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) 693129/1 Rejected (35-102) | |
2012-02-28 | Special Order until 2/29 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | Special Order until 2/28 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | Special Order until 2/24 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | Special Order until 2/22 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable with Amendments 522112/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2012-01-26 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-25 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Appeals
Circuit Courts
Hearings
Judges
Judicial Review
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
Circuit Courts
Hearings
Judges
Judicial Review
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners