MD HB199 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person in Wicomico County to hunt deer on private property on the second Sunday in deer firearms season from 30 minutes before sunrise until 10:30 a.m.
Title
Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-5) (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-5) (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592 |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-5) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {940016/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Animals
Birds
Boundaries
Guns
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Time
Weapons
Wicomico County
Zoning and Planning
Birds
Boundaries
Guns
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Time
Weapons
Wicomico County
Zoning and Planning