MD HB199 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB310
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which a certain provision of law requiring a campaign finance entity to terminate and file a final campaign finance report applies; altering the time period within which a certain campaign finance entity is required to terminate and file a final campaign finance report; requiring the State Board of Elections to provide a certain notification to certain persons affiliated with a campaign finance entity that is required to terminate under a certain provision of law; etc.
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2020-02-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-14 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-20 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB199 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Campaign Financing
Communications
Debt Collection
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Fees
Notices
Political Candidates
Political Parties
Records
Reports
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Campaign Financing
Communications
Debt Collection
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Fees
Notices
Political Candidates
Political Parties
Records
Reports
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 13 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |