MD HB201 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a licensed physical therapist to certify specified medical conditions of an applicant for a special disability registration number and special disability registration plates and for specified parking placards; requiring the State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners to be responsible for the development and maintenance of a database system with which the Motor Vehicle Administration can interface and verify licensure; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76 |
2015-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-30 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Electronic Government
Health
Health Occupations
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Registration
Parking
Physical Therapists
Records
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Disabilities
Electronic Government
Health
Health Occupations
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Registration
Parking
Physical Therapists
Records
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration