MD HB201 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to provide ridership services on transit vehicles to any permanent employee in any unit of the Executive Branch of State government, including a unit with an independent personnel system; prohibiting the Administration from collecting fees or reimbursement for certain transit services; and requiring the Maryland Department of Transportation and the Department of Budget and Management to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the cost and feasibility of expanding the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-16) (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-36) (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-21) (Y: 118 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (100-36)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (29-16)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {827178/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-02-14HouseThird Reading Passed (117-21)
2019-02-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {594964/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0201&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0201f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0201t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0201e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0201_59496401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0201_82717801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0201_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0091.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0201_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1014.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1202.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback