MD HB203 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the purpose of the Community Parks and Playgrounds Program to include making flexible grants available to the governing bodies of Baltimore County and Howard County for certain purposes; and altering a certain public policy.
Title
Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Baltimore County and Howard County - Expansion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-16 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB614 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Subjects
Baltimore County
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Forests and Parks
Grants
Howard County
Natural Resources - Generally
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Forests and Parks
Grants
Howard County
Natural Resources - Generally
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 5 | 9C-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |