MD HB209 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that an enabling act authorizing the creation of a State debt for at least $500,000, to be used by a hospital or institution of higher education to complete a capital project, must contain a provision that requires the grantee to submit reports to the Governor's Office of Minority Affairs regarding the extent to which the entity has used or will use any funds received under provisions of the Act for contracts with minority-owned businesses.
Title
General Obligation Bonds for Capital Projects - Required Reports
Sponsors
Del. Ana Gutierrez [D] | Del. Keith Haynes [D] | Del. Marvin Holmes [D] | Del. Tom Hucker [D] |
Del. Mary Love [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] | Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] | Del. Michael Vaughn [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-22 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-19 | Third Reading Passed (120-17) | |
2010-02-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-17 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted | |
2010-02-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Contractors
Contracts
Forms
Higher Education
Hospitals
Laws and Ordinances
Minorities
Reports
Small Business
State Bonds
Sunset
Contractors
Contracts
Forms
Higher Education
Hospitals
Laws and Ordinances
Minorities
Reports
Small Business
State Bonds
Sunset