MD HB209 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the salary of the chair of the Charles County Board of Education beginning in the year 2015 to $7,000 annually; increasing the salary for the vice chair and other nonstudent members of the county board beginning in the year 2015 to $6,000 and compensation for travel and other expenses to $800 annually; providing that members of the county board may be reimbursed for specified expenses after submitting expense vouchers and supporting receipts; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charles County - Board of Education - Salaries and Expenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-15HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2014-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2014-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2014-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2014-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2014-03-31SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-03-10SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2014-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2014-03-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2014-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2014-02-19HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-16HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback