MD HB209 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a provision of law that relates to the authority of the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to establish a specified board of directors for the purposes of establishing and overseeing a vocational training facility for specified purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

St. Mary's County - Vocational Training Facility - Repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 295
2017-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-03-20SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2017-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-14HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2017-03-07HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-20HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback