MD HB21 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to make available to the public on the Internet live video streaming of each open meeting of the authority held at the Authority's headquarters or any other location where the authority held at least 10 meetings in the preceding calendar year; requiring the Authority to make available to the public on the Internet complete and unedited archived video recordings of streamed open meetings; and requiring the Authority to make the archived video recordings available for a minimum of 4 years.
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Streaming and Archiving - Open Meetings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-1) |
2019-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {766485/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-07-03 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Communications
Disclosure
Electronic Surveillance
Information Technology, Department of
Open Government
Recordings
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Video
Work, Labor and Employment
Communications
Disclosure
Electronic Surveillance
Information Technology, Department of
Open Government
Recordings
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Video
Work, Labor and Employment