MD HB212 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2009 to allow the matching fund requirement for the Board of Directors of the Southern High School Sports Booster Club, Inc. to include funds expended prior to June 1, 2010.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2009 - Anne Arundel County -
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-10 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/2 at 2:30 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 2/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0212.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0212f.pdf |