MD HB212 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a specified officer in Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Talbot County to request from the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services a State and national criminal history records check for a prospective county employee or volunteer; requiring that a specified officer submit sets of fingerprints and fees to the Central Repository as part of the application for a criminal history records check; etc.
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Talbot County - Prospective Employees
Sponsors
Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] | Del. Jeannie Haddaway-Riccio [D] | Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] | Del. Jay Jacobs [R] |
Del. Michael McDermott [R] | Del. Michael Smigiel [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2012-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-17 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-29 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-02-14 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-13 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-25 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Caroline County
Criminal Background Investigations
Dorchester County
Fees
Fingerprinting
Forms
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Talbot County
Volunteers
Wicomico County
Work, Labor and Employment
Criminal Background Investigations
Dorchester County
Fees
Fingerprinting
Forms
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Talbot County
Volunteers
Wicomico County
Work, Labor and Employment