MD HB212 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a maximum fine of $500 for a violation of specified prohibitions against using a handheld telephone while driving a motor vehicle; providing that the court may waive the penalty for a person convicted of a first offense who provides proof that the person has acquired specified phone accessories that will allow the person to operate a motor vehicle in accordance with specified provisions of law; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-30) (Y: 107 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (107-30) |
2016-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {800719/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Fines
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road