MD HB212 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a consumer reporting agency from charging a consumer a fee for placing a security freeze if the consumer has not previously requested the placement of a security freeze from the consumer reporting agency; and altering the contents of a specified notice that must be included with a specified summary of rights provided to the consumer.
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-36) (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-13) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-49) (Y: 87 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-36) (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-13) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-49) (Y: 87 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-36) |
2017-04-10 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senators Feldman, Reilly, and Klausmeier |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2017-04-05 | House | Delegates Waldstreicher, Aumann, and Kramer |
2017-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2017-04-05 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2017-04-05 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (33-13) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {757571/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (87-49) |
2017-02-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-13 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-24 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Consumer Protection
Credit
Cybersecurity
Federal Government
Fees
Fraud
Notices
Privacy
Records
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Consumer Protection
Credit
Cybersecurity
Federal Government
Fees
Fraud
Notices
Privacy
Records
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time