MD HB214 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation to acquire specified interests in property for specified purposes and to dispose of property under specified circumstances in accordance with the Critical Farms Program; requiring the development of a specified method and procedure for a specified purpose; establishing a Critical Farms Fund; requiring the Foundation to submit a specified report; and exempting specified dispositions of real property from approval by the Board of Public Works.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Critical Farms Fund and

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-19 Approved by the Governor
2011-03-31 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2011-03-30 Second Reading Passed
2011-03-30 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-04-01 Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2011-03-16 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-03-07 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2011-03-31 Returned Passed
2011-03-04 Third Reading Passed (138-0)
2011-03-01 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-03-01 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2011-02-28 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2011-02-02 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-01-28 First Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback