MD HB214 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Harford Community College Board of Trustees to borrow money for specified purposes and secure debt in a specified manner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harford County - Harford Community College - Authority to Incur Debt

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-10 Approved by the Governor
2012-03-26 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2012-03-25 Second Reading Passed
2012-03-25 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-03-29 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2012-03-14 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-02-17 First Reading Budget and Taxation
2012-03-28 Returned Passed
2012-02-16 Third Reading Passed (134-1)
2012-02-14 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-02-14 Favorable with Amendments 604865/1 Report Adopted
2012-02-13 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2012-01-25 Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-01-25 First Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback