MD HB214 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a driver of a motor vehicle that passes a bicycle, an EPAMD, or a motor scooter at a distance of less than 3 feet in accordance with a specified provision of law to slow to a reasonable and prudent speed that is safe for existing weather, road, and vehicular or pedestrian traffic conditions and does not endanger, impede, or interfere with the bicycle, EPAMD, motor scooter or other traffic; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (114-24) (Y: 114 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-21SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2016-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (114-24)
2016-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {430614/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2016-02-11HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
2016-01-22HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback