MD HB215 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a custodian of records to grant inspection of part of a 9-1-1 communications record under certain circumstances after providing certain notice and considering certain information; requiring a custodian to grant or deny a certain application within a certain period of time; authorizing a custodian to redact certain information if a failure to do so would result in a constructive denial of the entire public record; requiring a custodian to allow inspection by the person in interest; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-04-04SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-04-02SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-29HouseFavorable with Amendments {146088/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback