MD HB216 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the operation of a speed monitoring system in a school zone that extends beyond a single county to the county in which the school is located.
Title
Speed Monitoring Systems - School Zone in Multiple Counties - Limitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boundaries
Higher Education
Highways
Jurisdiction
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Operation
Prince George's County
Private Schools
Public Schools
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Zoning and Planning
Higher Education
Highways
Jurisdiction
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Operation
Prince George's County
Private Schools
Public Schools
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Zoning and Planning