MD HB221 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the Task Force on the Use of Master Meters for Utility Services in Prince George's County by 1 year; and extending the deadline for the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the Prince George's County Delegation to the General Assembly by 1 year to December 31, 2019.
Title
Prince George's County - Utility Services - Master Meters Task Force - Extension PG 407-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-02-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-02-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-14 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Bi-County Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Prince George's County
Real Property
Sunset
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Committees and Commissions
Prince George's County
Real Property
Sunset
Utilities
Utility Regulation