MD HB226 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB73
Note: Carry Over of previous HB107
Note: Carry Over of previous HB107
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Baltimore City to recover the costs of implementing and administering a traffic control signal monitoring system, a speed monitoring system, a school bus monitoring camera, or a vehicle height monitoring system; requiring Baltimore City, after recovering costs, to spend the remaining balance of fines collected from the monitoring systems solely on public safety or transportation infrastructure improvements consistent with the purpose and goals of the Complete Streets Program and the Complete Streets Transportation System; etc.
Title
Baltimore City – Complete Streets Program Funding – Traffic and Vehicle Monitoring Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-24 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB226 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
HB107 (Carry Over) 2020-03-14 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB107 (Carry Over) 2020-03-14 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Baltimore City
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
School Buses
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
School Buses
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |