MD HB23 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an officer, an employee, an agent, or a contractor of the State or a political subdivision to deny inspection by a federal agency seeking access for certain immigration enforcement matters of a public record that contains personal information or certain photographic images unless a valid warrant is provided; prohibiting certain persons from disclosing certain information to a federal agent or a federal agency under certain circumstances; requiring a certain annual report to the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access (Maryland Driver Privacy Act)
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 86 N: 47 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 86 N: 47 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-42) |
2021-04-12 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {368374/1 Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (86-47) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {322217/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-22 | House | Reassigned to Judiciary Environment and Transportation |
2021-01-15 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-07-13 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB234 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-09 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Biometrics
Contractors
Data
Disclosure
Federal Government
Identification
Immigrants and Citizenship
Inspections
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Notices
Photography
Privacy
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Reports
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Warrants
Agents and Brokers
Biometrics
Contractors
Data
Disclosure
Federal Government
Identification
Immigrants and Citizenship
Inspections
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Notices
Photography
Privacy
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Reports
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Warrants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 4 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 4 | 320.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 523 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |