MD HB231 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the housing policy of the State to include providing for fair housing to all citizens regardless of source of income; stating the Act seeks to deconcentrate poverty by providing additional opportunities for tenants utilizing public subsidies to live in certain neighborhoods; prohibiting a person from refusing to sell or rent a dwelling to any person because of source of income; establishing qualifications and limitations on the prohibition against discrimination in housing based on source of income; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 116
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (31-15)
2020-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-12SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (95-42)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {840115/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseMotion Special Order until 3/10 (Delegate Holmes) Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {840115/1
2020-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-17HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-17HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB530 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 117

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government201103(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20701(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20702(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20704(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20705(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20707(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback