MD HB237 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing all counties, rather than counties with fewer than a certain number of registered voters, to establish one early voting center in addition to the number of early voting centers the county is required to establish if the State Board of Elections, in collaboration with the local board of elections, and the governing body of the county agree to establish an additional early voting center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-18) (Y: 119 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-29) (Y: 113 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 539
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (119-18)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (43-3)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {614133/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateSpecial Order until 4/5 (Senator Hayes) Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {614133/1
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-08SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-25SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (112-29)
2019-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-20HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-18HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-24HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0237&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0237f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0237t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0237e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_539_hb0237e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0237_61413301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb0237.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0237_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0137.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0237_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1289.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1527.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback