MD HB238 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Superintendent of Schools to provide a county superintendent of schools, if the State Superintendent plans to remove the county superintendent, with the reason for removal, documentation supporting the case for removal, and the opportunity to request a hearing within 10 days; authorizing a county board of education to remove a county superintendent in a certain manner; and authorizing a county superintendent to appeal a certain decision by the county board to the State Board of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-3) (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 443
2019-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (138-1)
2019-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (40-3)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02SenateFloor Amendment {203427/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateSpecial Order until 4/2 (Senator Lam) Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {695364/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-24HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0238&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0238f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0238t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0238e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_443_hb0238e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0238_69536401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0238_20342701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0238.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0238_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0375.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0238_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1100.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1355.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback