MD HB242 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person in Cecil County to hunt any game bird or mammal, except migratory game birds, on a Sunday on certain land during the open season for that game bird or mammal; repealing an exception for wetland game birds from a certain authorization to allow a person in certain counties to hunt certain game birds or mammals on a Sunday on certain land during the open season for that game bird or game mammal; establishing for archery hunters a safety zone of 50 yards; etc.
Title
Cecil County - Natural Resources - Hunting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-4) (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-4) (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171 |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-4) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {640510/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Stein) Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {640510/1 |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Animals
Birds
Boundaries
Cecil County
Counties - Local Laws
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Safety
Time
Zoning and Planning
Birds
Boundaries
Cecil County
Counties - Local Laws
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Safety
Time
Zoning and Planning