MD HB245 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to hunt turkey in Allegany County and Garrett County on the last Sunday in April and the first Sunday in May, except on Easter Sunday.
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Turkey Hunting - Sundays
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading Passed (131-5) | |
2010-02-26 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-25 | First Reading Environmental Matters |