MD HB246 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting returned Peace Corps volunteers who have been certified by the Peace Corps as having served satisfactorily as a volunteer and who are domiciled in the State from paying nonresident tuition at a public institution of higher education in the State; establishing that returned Peace Corps volunteers who attend a community college in the State and pay tuition are to be included as in-State residents for computation of State aid to community colleges; and requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to adopt certain regulations.
Title
Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
Sponsors
Del. Terri Hill [D] | Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2021-02-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {484665/1 Adopted |
2021-02-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2020-10-31 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB554 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Community Colleges
Higher Education
Residency
Rules and Regulations
State Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Volunteers
Higher Education
Residency
Rules and Regulations
State Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Volunteers