MD HB248 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the Governor's required appropriation of certain funds in the State budget, beginning in fiscal year 2021, to increase the Child Care Subsidy Program reimbursement rate to the 60th percentile of the most recent market rate survey or a certain equivalent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Level

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-11) (Y: 129 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
2019-03-26HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-02-14HouseThird Reading Passed (128-11)
2019-02-12HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-12HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-11HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-24HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback