MD HB25 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, instead of authorizing, the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program to review prescription monitoring data for indications of a possible misuse or abuse of a monitored prescription drug; requiring the Program to report the possible misuse or abuse to the prescriber or dispenser of the monitored prescription drug and to provide certain education to the prescriber or dispenser; authorizing the Program to provide prescription monitoring data to the Office of Controlled Substances Administration for further investigation; etc.
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531 |
2019-03-29 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {367970/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {866983/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-09-11 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Drugs
Education
Ethics
Examinations
Health
Health Occupations
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Reports
Safety
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Drugs
Education
Ethics
Examinations
Health
Health Occupations
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Reports
Safety
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology