MD HB251 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Aging to make grants to certain nonprofit organizations and area agencies on aging to expand and establish certain aging-in-place programs for seniors; requiring the Department to publicize the availability of the grants at least 6 weeks before the applications are due; establishing a requirement for an equal match for certain funds; requiring the Department to notify an area agency on aging within 2 weeks after a grant award is made to a nonprofit located within the agency's jurisdiction; etc.
Title
Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs (Nonprofits for our Aging Neighbors Act - "NANA")
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed 47-0 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308 |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {926085/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-24 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Advertising
Aging, Department of
Appropriations
Budgets
Counties
Elderly
Elderly Persons
Governor
Grants
Home Care Services
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Aging, Department of
Appropriations
Budgets
Counties
Elderly
Elderly Persons
Governor
Grants
Home Care Services
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Rules and Regulations