MD HB253 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB511
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definitions of "community association" and "local code violation" for purposes of certain provisions of law authorizing community associations to seek judicial relief for nuisance abatement in Baltimore County; repealing a provision of law requiring a certain court to determine in what amount and under what conditions a bond must be filed by a community association in a certain nuisance action; including in the definition of "community association" an association that represents two or more individual community associations; etc.
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-2) |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-09-18 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB511 (Carry Over) 2020-02-14 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Baltimore County
Boundaries
Courts
Judicial Review
Laws and Ordinances
Nonprofit Organizations
Nuisances
Real Property
Boundaries
Courts
Judicial Review
Laws and Ordinances
Nonprofit Organizations
Nuisances
Real Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 14 | 125 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |