MD HB256 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health and the Department of Human Services, to develop guidelines on a trauma-informed approach; defining "trauma-informed approach" as a method for understanding and responding to an individual with symptoms of chronic interpersonal trauma or traumatic stress; and requiring the State Department of Education to distribute certain guidelines to each local school system and publish certain guidelines on the Department's website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {595668/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback